Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Johann Baptist von Neudecker

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of München und Freising {Munich}

Titular Bishop of Helenopolis in Bithynia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Apr 1840BornThalham
5 Jun 186424.2Ordained PriestPriest of München und Freising {Munich}, Germany
8 Mar 191170.9AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of München und Freising {Munich}, Germany
8 Mar 191170.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Helenopolis in Bithynia
26 Mar 191171.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Helenopolis in Bithynia
15 Oct 192686.5DiedAuxiliary Bishop of München und Freising {Munich}, Germany

MicroData Summary for Johann Baptist von Neudecker:
Bishop Johann Baptist von Neudecker (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of München und Freising {Munich}

  • a priest for 62.4 years
  • a bishop for 15.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1911, Number 26
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 9, Page 194

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013