Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Ignaz von Senestréy

Deceased

Bishop of Regensburg, Germany


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Jul 1818Born
19 Mar 184223.6Ordained PriestPriest of Regensburg, Germany
27 Jan 185839.5SelectedBishop of Regensburg, Germany
18 Mar 185839.6ConfirmedBishop of Regensburg, Germany
2 May 185839.8Ordained BishopBishop of Regensburg, Germany
16 Aug 190688.0DiedBishop of Regensburg, Germany

MicroData Summary for Ignaz von Senestréy (VIAF: 67258384)
Bishop Ignaz von Senestréy (born , died ) Bishop of Regensburg

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBärnau
Ordained BishopCathedral, Regensburg, Diocese of Regensburg

  • a priest for 64.4 years
  • a bishop for 48.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 476
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1858, Number 26

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 5 Jun 2017