Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Johann Valentin von Reißmann

Deceased

Bishop of Würzburg


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Nov 1807BornAllersheim
5 Jun 182921.6Ordained DeaconDeacon of Würzburg, Germany
25 Nov 183023.0Ordained PriestPriest of Würzburg, Germany
26 Oct 187063.0SelectedBishop of Würzburg, Germany
6 Mar 187163.3ConfirmedBishop of Würzburg, Germany
9 Jul 187163.7Ordained BishopBishop of Würzburg, Germany
17 Nov 187568.0DiedBishop of Würzburg, Germany

MicroData Summary for Johann Valentin von Reißmann:
Bishop Johann Valentin von Reißmann (born , died ) Bishop of Würzburg

  • a priest for 45.0 years
  • a bishop for 4.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 303

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013