Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Konrad Reither

Deceased

Bishop of Speyer


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Apr 1814BornGöcklingen
31 Dec 183824.7Ordained PriestPriest of Speyer, Germany
6 May 187056.0SelectedBishop of Speyer, Germany
27 Jun 187056.2ConfirmedBishop of Speyer, Germany
18 Sep 187056.4Ordained BishopBishop of Speyer, Germany
4 Apr 187156.9DiedBishop of Speyer, Germany

MicroData Summary for Konrad Reither:
Bishop Konrad Reither (born , died ) Bishop of Speyer

  • a priest for 32.3 years
  • a bishop for .5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 526

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013