Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Michael von Rampf

Deceased

Bishop of Passau, Germany


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Oct 1825Born
17 Jun 184822.7Ordained PriestPriest of München und Freising {Munich}, Germany
8 Dec 188964.1SelectedBishop of Passau, Germany
30 Dec 188964.2ConfirmedBishop of Passau, Germany
11 May 189064.6Ordained BishopBishop of Passau, Germany
29 Mar 190175.4DiedBishop of Passau, Germany

MicroData Summary for Michael von Rampf (VIAF: 45114309)
Bishop Michael von Rampf (born , died ) Bishop of Passau

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMunich, Archdiocese of München und Freising {Munich}
Ordained BishopCathedral, Passau, Diocese of Passau

  • a priest for 52.7 years
  • a bishop for 10.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 442
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1890, Number 27

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 5 Jun 2017