Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Anton von Steichele

Deceased

Archbishop of München und Freising {Munich}, Germany


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Jan 1816Born
20 Apr 183822.2Ordained DeaconDeacon of Augsburg, Germany
28 Aug 183822.5Ordained PriestPriest of Augsburg, Germany
30 Apr 187862.2SelectedArchbishop of München und Freising {Munich}, Germany
15 Jul 187862.4ConfirmedArchbishop of München und Freising {Munich}, Germany
13 Oct 187862.7Ordained BishopArchbishop of München und Freising {Munich}, Germany
9 Oct 188973.7DiedArchbishop of München und Freising {Munich}, Germany

MicroData Summary for Anton von Steichele (VIAF: 37688610)
Archbishop Anton von Steichele (born , died ) Archbishop of München und Freising {Munich}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMertingen, Diocese of Augsburg
Ordained BishopCathedral, München, Archdiocese of München und Freising {Munich}

  • a priest for 51.1 years
  • a bishop for 10.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 390
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1878, Number 46

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 19 Mar 2017