Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Joseph Franz von Weckert

Deceased

Bishop of Passau, Germany


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Sep 1822Born
2 Apr 184522.5Ordained PriestPriest of Augsburg, Germany
4 Oct 187553.0SelectedBishop of Passau, Germany
28 Jan 187653.3ConfirmedBishop of Passau, Germany
30 Apr 187653.6Ordained BishopBishop of Passau, Germany
13 Mar 188966.5DiedBishop of Passau, Germany

MicroData Summary for Joseph Franz von Weckert (VIAF: 783382)
Bishop Joseph Franz von Weckert (born , died ) Bishop of Passau

EventPlace
Birth PlaceWallerstein, Diocese of Augsburg
Ordained BishopCathedral, Passau, Diocese of Passau

  • a priest for 43.9 years
  • a bishop for 12.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 442
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1876, Number 27
  • c2: CB, 5 Aug 2017

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 6 Aug 2017