Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Heinrich von Hofstätter

Deceased

Bishop of Passau, Germany


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Feb 1805Born
5 Aug 183328.4Ordained PriestPriest of München und Freising {Munich}, Germany
6 Jul 183934.3SelectedBishop of Passau, Germany
23 Dec 183934.8ConfirmedBishop of Passau, Germany
25 Feb 184035.0Ordained BishopBishop of Passau, Germany
12 May 187570.2DiedBishop of Passau, Germany

MicroData Summary for Heinrich von Hofstätter (VIAF: 45067637)
Bishop Heinrich von Hofstätter (born , died ) Bishop of Passau

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAindling, Archdiocese of München und Freising {Munich}
Ordained BishopCathedral, Munich, Archdiocese of München und Freising {Munich}

  • a priest for 41.7 years
  • a bishop for 35.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 300
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,840, Number 8

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast