Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Karl Borromäus Flügel

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Regensburg, Germany

Titular Bishop of Altiburus


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Aug 1915Born
29 Jun 194933.8Ordained PriestPriest of Regensburg, Germany
7 Sep 196853.0AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Regensburg, Germany
7 Sep 196853.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Altiburus
7 Oct 196853.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Altiburus
20 Aug 198469.0ResignedAuxiliary Bishop of Regensburg, Germany
1 Jun 200488.7DiedAuxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Regensburg, Germany

MicroData Summary for Karl Borromäus Flügel
Bishop Karl Borromäus Flügel (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Regensburg

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAmberg

  • a priest for 54.9 years
  • a bishop for 35.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 177, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018