Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Johann Bernard Wilhelm Maria Möller

Deceased

Bishop of Groningen


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
31 Oct 1923BornRotterdam
24 Jul 194925.7Ordained PriestPriest
21 May 196945.6AppointedBishop of Groningen, Netherlands
28 Jun 196945.7Ordained BishopBishop of Groningen, Netherlands
26 Apr 199975.5DiedBishop of Groningen, Netherlands

MicroData Summary for Johann Bernard Wilhelm Maria Möller:
Bishop Johann Bernard Wilhelm Maria Möller (born , died ) Bishop of Groningen

  • a priest for 49.8 years
  • a bishop for 29.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 108
  • ob/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 155, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 158, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013