Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Johannes Harmannes Jozefus van den Hende

Bishop of Rotterdam


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 Jan 1964 BornGroningen
6 Apr 199127.2Ordained PriestPriest of Groningen, Netherlands
9 Sep 200642.7AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Breda, Netherlands
25 Nov 200642.9Ordained BishopCoadjutor Bishop of Breda, Netherlands
31 Oct 200743.8SucceededBishop of Breda, Netherlands
10 May 201147.3AppointedBishop of Rotterdam, Netherlands
2 Jul 201147.5InstalledBishop of Rotterdam, Netherlands

MicroData Summary for Johannes Harmannes Jozefus van den Hende:
Bishop Johannes Harmannes Jozefus van den Hende (born ) Bishop of Rotterdam

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Rotterdam.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 9 Sep 2006
  • ob/c2+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 187, Number 15,282
  • s: Bollettino, 31 Oct 2007
  • ab: Bollettino, 10 May 2011

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013