Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Theodorus Cornelis Maria Hoogenboom

Auxiliary Bishop of Utrecht, Netherlands

Titular Bishop of Bistue


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 Aug 1960 Born
25 Sep 199939.0Ordained PriestPriest of Utrecht, Netherlands
7 Dec 200949.2AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Utrecht, Netherlands
7 Dec 200949.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Bistue
13 Feb 201049.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Bistue

MicroData Summary for Theodorus Cornelis Maria Hoogenboom
Bishop Theodorus Cornelis Maria Hoogenboom (born ) Auxiliary Bishop of Utrecht

EventPlace
Birth PlaceOudewater

Please contact the Bishop through the Archdiocese of Utrecht.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 7 Dec 2009
  • ob/c2+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 201, Number 16,572

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 8 Jul 2017