Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Willem Jacobus Cardinal Eijk

Archbishop of Utrecht

Cardinal-Priest of San Callisto


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Jun 1953 BornDuivendrecht
1 Jun 198531.9Ordained PriestPriest of Roermond, Netherlands
17 Jul 199946.1AppointedBishop of Groningen, Netherlands
6 Nov 199946.4Ordained BishopBishop of Groningen, Netherlands
11 Dec 200754.5AppointedArchbishop of Utrecht, Netherlands
26 Jan 200854.6InstalledArchbishop of Utrecht, Netherlands
18 Feb 201258.7Elevated to Cardinal
18 Feb 201258.7AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Callisto
17 May 201258.9InstalledCardinal-Priest of San Callisto

MicroData Summary for Willem Jacobus Eijk:
Cardinal Willem Jacobus Eijk (born ) Archbishop of Utrecht

Please contact the Cardinal through the Archdiocese of Utrecht.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
  • a cardinal for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ab: Bollettino, 11 Dec 2007
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 157, Number 13,646
  • card: Bollettino, 6 Jan 2012
  • 1c05: Bollettino, 18 Feb 2012
  • i: Bollettino, 11 May 2012

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013