Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Herman Willebrordus Woorts

Auxiliary Bishop of Utrecht, Netherlands

Titular Bishop of Giufi Salaria


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Nov 1963 Born
22 Feb 199228.2Ordained PriestPriest of Utrecht, Netherlands
7 Dec 200946.0AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Utrecht, Netherlands
7 Dec 200946.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Giufi Salaria
13 Feb 201046.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Giufi Salaria

MicroData Summary for Herman Willebrordus Woorts
Bishop Herman Willebrordus Woorts (born ) Auxiliary Bishop of Utrecht

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAbcoude

Please contact the Bishop through the Archdiocese of Utrecht.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 7 Dec 2009
  • ob/c2+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 201, Number 16,571

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018