Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Johannes Willibrordus Maria Hendriks

Coadjutor Bishop of Haarlem-Amsterdam, Netherlands


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Nov 1954 Born
24 Mar 197924.3Ordained DeaconDeacon of Rotterdam, Netherlands
29 Sep 197924.8Ordained PriestPriest of Rotterdam, Netherlands
25 Oct 201156.9AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Haarlem-Amsterdam, Netherlands
25 Oct 201156.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Arsacal
10 Dec 201157.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Arsacal
22 Dec 201864.0AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Haarlem-Amsterdam, Netherlands

MicroData Summary for Johannes Willibrordus Maria Hendriks
Bishop Johannes Willibrordus Maria Hendriks (born ) Coadjutor Bishop of Haarlem-Amsterdam

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLeidschendam, Diocese of Rotterdam
Ordained BishopSint Vitus, Church, Hilversum

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Haarlem-Amsterdam.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 25 Oct 2011
  • ob: CB, 25 Oct 2011
  • c2+: CB, 28 Oct 2011
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 208, Number 17,189
  • ab: Bollettino, 22 Dec 2018
  • od: AM, 22 Dec 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.2.2, 14 Oct 2018; Data: 24 Dec 2018

Quantcast