Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Martinus Petrus Maria Muskens

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Breda


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Dec 1935BornElshout
16 Jun 196226.5Ordained PriestPriest
23 Jul 199458.6AppointedBishop of Breda, Netherlands
26 Nov 199459.0Ordained BishopBishop of Breda, Netherlands
31 Oct 200771.9ResignedBishop of Breda, Netherlands
16 Apr 2013³77.3DiedBishop Emeritus of Breda, Netherlands

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Martinus Petrus Maria Muskens:
Bishop Martinus Petrus Maria Muskens (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Breda

  • a priest for 50.8 years
  • a bishop for 18.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 31 Oct 2007
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 140, Number 12,451
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 141, Additions/Corrections (front)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013