Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Antonius Lambertus Maria Hurkmans

Bishop Emeritus of ’s Hertogenbosch (Bois-le-Duc)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Aug 1944 BornSomeren
22 Dec 197935.3Ordained PriestPriest
13 Jun 199853.8AppointedBishop of ’s Hertogenbosch (Bois-le-Duc), Netherlands
29 Aug 199854.0Ordained BishopBishop of ’s Hertogenbosch (Bois-le-Duc), Netherlands
5 Mar 201671.5ResignedBishop of ’s Hertogenbosch (Bois-le-Duc), Netherlands

MicroData Summary for Antonius Lambertus Maria Hurkmans
Bishop Antonius Lambertus Maria Hurkmans (born ) Bishop Emeritus of ’s Hertogenbosch (Bois-le-Duc)

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of ’s Hertogenbosch (Bois-le-Duc).

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 152, Number 13,376
  • r: Bollettino, 5 Mar 2016

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.3, 5 Feb 2016; Data: 5 Mar 2016