Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Robertus Gerardus Leonia Maria Mutsaerts

Auxiliary Bishop of ’s Hertogenbosch (Bois-le-Duc), Netherlands

Titular Bishop of Uccula


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 May 1958 Born
5 Jun 199335.0Ordained PriestPriest of ’s Hertogenbosch (Bois-le-Duc), Netherlands
15 Jul 201052.1AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of ’s Hertogenbosch (Bois-le-Duc), Netherlands
15 Jul 201052.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Uccula
18 Sep 201052.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Uccula

MicroData Summary for Robertus Gerardus Leonia Maria Mutsaerts
Bishop Robertus Gerardus Leonia Maria Mutsaerts (born ) Auxiliary Bishop of ’s Hertogenbosch (Bois-le-Duc)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceTilburg

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of ’s Hertogenbosch (Bois-le-Duc).

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 15 Jul 2010
  • ob/c2+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 203, Number 16,797

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 3 Apr 2017