Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Joseph Frans Lescrauwaet, M.S.C. †

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Haarlem

Titular Bishop of Turres Concordiae


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Jun 1923BornAmsterdam
12 Sep 194825.2Ordained PriestPriest of Missionaries of the Sacred Heart of Jesus
19 Oct 198360.3AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Haarlem, Netherlands
19 Oct 198360.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Turres Concordiae
14 Jan 198460.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Turres Concordiae
22 Mar 199571.7ResignedAuxiliary Bishop of Haarlem, Netherlands
19 Nov 201390.4DiedAuxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Haarlem, Netherlands

MicroData Summary for Joseph Frans Lescrauwaet:
Bishop Joseph Frans Lescrauwaet M.S.C. (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Haarlem

  • a priest for 65.1 years
  • a bishop for 29.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 216, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015