Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Johannes Wilhelmus Maria Liesen

Bishop of Breda


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Sep 1960 BornOosterhout
16 Jun 198423.7Ordained PriestPriest of Roermond, Netherlands
15 Jul 201049.8AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of ’s Hertogenbosch (Bois-le-Duc), Netherlands
15 Jul 201049.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Tunnuna
18 Sep 201050.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Tunnuna
26 Nov 201151.2AppointedBishop of Breda, Netherlands
28 Jan 201251.4InstalledBishop of Breda, Netherlands

MicroData Summary for Johannes Wilhelmus Maria Liesen:
Bishop Johannes Wilhelmus Maria Liesen (born ) Bishop of Breda

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Breda.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 15 Jul 2010
  • ob/c2+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 203, Number 16,796
  • ab: Bollettino, 26 Nov 2011

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013