Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Leo Soekoto, S.J. †

Deceased

Archbishop of Jakarta, Indonesia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Oct 1920Born
22 Aug 195332.8Ordained PriestPriest of Society of Jesus
21 May 197049.5AppointedArchbishop of Djakarta, Indonesia
15 Aug 197049.8Ordained BishopArchbishop of Djakarta, Indonesia
30 Dec 199575.1DiedArchbishop of Jakarta, Indonesia

MicroData Summary for Leo Soekoto
Archbishop Leo Soekoto S.J. (born , died ) Archbishop of Jakarta

EventPlace
Birth PlaceJali

  • a priest for 42.3 years
  • a bishop for 25.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 137
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 144

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018