Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Ignatius Harsono

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Bogor, Indonesia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Dec 1922Born
6 Jan 195835.0Ordained PriestPriest
30 Jan 197552.1AppointedBishop of Bogor, Indonesia
8 May 197552.3Ordained BishopBishop of Bogor, Indonesia
17 Jul 199370.5ResignedBishop of Bogor, Indonesia
1 Mar 200077.2DiedBishop Emeritus of Bogor, Indonesia

MicroData Summary for Ignatius Harsono
Bishop Ignatius Harsono (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Bogor

EventPlace
Birth PlaceDelanggu

  • a priest for 42.1 years
  • a bishop for 24.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 137
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 162, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018