Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Theodorus Henricus Johannes Zwartkruis

Deceased

Bishop of Haarlem, Netherlands


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Nov 1909Born
26 May 193424.5Ordained PriestPriest of Haarlem, Netherlands
18 Aug 196656.7AppointedBishop of Haarlem, Netherlands
15 Oct 196656.8Ordained BishopBishop of Haarlem, Netherlands
21 Oct 198373.9DiedBishop of Haarlem, Netherlands

MicroData Summary for Theodorus Henricus Johannes Zwartkruis (VIAF: 291819254)
Bishop Theodorus Henricus Johannes Zwartkruis (born , died ) Bishop of Haarlem

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAmsterdam

  • a priest for 49.4 years
  • a bishop for 17.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 108

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018