Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Martien Antoon Jansen

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Rotterdam


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 Aug 1905BornAmsterdam
25 May 192923.7Ordained PriestPriest
10 Mar 195650.5AppointedBishop of Rotterdam, Netherlands
8 May 195650.7Ordained BishopBishop of Rotterdam, Netherlands
2 Jan 197064.3ResignedBishop of Rotterdam, Netherlands
2 Jan 197064.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Basti
29 Nov 197065.3ResignedTitular Bishop of Basti
28 Mar 198377.6DiedBishop Emeritus of Rotterdam, Netherlands

MicroData Summary for Martien Antoon Jansen:
Bishop Martien Antoon Jansen (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Rotterdam

  • a priest for 53.8 years
  • a bishop for 26.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1956, Number 35

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013