Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Gerardus Henricus De Vet

Deceased

Bishop of Breda, Netherlands


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Nov 1917Born
19 Jun 194325.5Ordained PriestPriest
22 Mar 196244.3AppointedBishop of Breda, Netherlands
13 May 196244.4Ordained BishopBishop of Breda, Netherlands
27 Mar 196749.3DiedBishop of Breda, Netherlands

MicroData Summary for Gerardus Henricus De Vet
Bishop Gerardus Henricus De Vet (born , died ) Bishop of Breda

EventPlace
Birth PlaceGilze

  • a priest for 23.7 years
  • a bishop for 4.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1962, Number 54

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018