Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Tiago Gerardo Cloin, C.SS.R. †

Deceased

Bishop of Barra (do Rio Grande), Baia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Apr 1908BornDongen, Netherlands
8 Sep 192820.4ProfessedMember of Congregation of the Most Holy Redeemer
27 Sep 193325.5Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Most Holy Redeemer
9 Dec 196658.7AppointedBishop of Barra (do Rio Grande), Baia, Brazil
28 Jan 196758.8Ordained BishopBishop of Barra (do Rio Grande), Baia, Brazil
24 Oct 197567.5DiedBishop of Barra (do Rio Grande), Baia, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Tiago Gerardo Cloin:
Bishop Tiago Gerardo Cloin C.SS.R. (born , died ) Bishop of Barra (do Rio Grande)

  • a priest for 42.1 years
  • a bishop for 8.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.3, 27 Sep 2013; data: 29 Sep 2013