Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Vicariate Apostolic of Jimma-Bonga

Apostolicus Vicariatus Gimmaensis-Bonganus



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

  • Markos Ghebremedhin, C.M., Vicar Apostolic

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Vicariate Apostolic
  • Elevated: 5 December 2009
  • Vicariate
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: Ethiopia
  • Square Kilometers: 51,200 (19,776 Square Miles)
  • Mailing Address: P.O. Box 202, Jimma, Ethiopia
  • Telephone: (047)111.02.83
  • Fax: 111.06.35

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Prefecture Apostolic of Jimma-Bonga
10 June 1994ErectedVicariate Apostolic of Nekemte Prefecture Apostolic of Jimma-Bonga (erected)
16 November 2000Territory LostPrefecture Apostolic of Jimma-Bonga Prefecture Apostolic of Gambella (erected)
Vicariate Apostolic of Jimma-Bonga
5 December 2009ElevatedPrefecture Apostolic of Jimma-Bonga Vicariate Apostolic of Jimma-Bonga

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Prefecture Apostolic of Jimma-Bonga
199947,5004,500,5001.1%1785,93713217ap2000
200010,0004,790,000.2%2911909122116ap2001
200110,0832,800,000.4%881,260141010ap2002
200210,3783,000,000.3%881,297111114ap2003
200310,7533,099,900.3%881,344111114ap2004
200411,2353,200,400.4%881,404101417ap2005
Vicariate Apostolic of Jimma-Bonga
201020,0003,794,615.5%12921952151734ap2011

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2011
code: v2.7.5, 23 Nov 2011; data: 3 Dec 2011