Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archeparchy of Addis Abeba (Ethiopian)

Neanthopolitanus



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)


Suffragan Dioceses

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Archeparchy
  • Elevated: 20 February 1961
  • Metropolitan See
  • Ethiopian Catholic Church of the Alexandrian Tradition
  • Country: Ethiopia
  • Square Kilometers: 291,424 (112,562 Square Miles)
  • Mailing Address: Catholic Archbishop's House, P.O. Box 21903, Addis Ababa, Ethiopia
  • Telephone: (011)111.16.67
  • Fax: 155.13.48

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Prefecture Apostolic of Abyssinia
1839ErectedPrefecture Apostolic of Abyssinia (erected)
4 May 1846Territory LostPrefecture Apostolic of Abyssinia Vicariate Apostolic of Galla (erected)
Vicariate Apostolic of Abyssinia
1847ElevatedPrefecture Apostolic of Abyssinia Vicariate Apostolic of Abyssinia
25 March 1937Territory LostVicariate Apostolic of Abyssinia Prefecture Apostolic of Tigrai (erected)
25 March 1937Territory LostVicariate Apostolic of Abyssinia Prefecture Apostolic of Dessié (erected)
25 March 1937Territory LostVicariate Apostolic of Abyssinia Prefecture Apostolic of Gondar (erected)
Vicariate Apostolic of Addis Abeba
25 March 1937Name ChangedVicariate Apostolic of Abyssinia Vicariate Apostolic of Addis Abeba
Apostolic Exarchate of Addis Abeba (Ethiopian)
31 October 1951ErectedVicariate Apostolic of Addis Abeba (suppressed)
Prefecture Apostolic of Dessié (suppressed)
Prefecture Apostolic of Endeber (suppressed)
Prefecture Apostolic of Gondar (suppressed)
Apostolic Exarchate of Addis Abeba (Ethiopian) (erected)
Archeparchy of Addis Abeba (Ethiopian)
20 February 1961ElevatedApostolic Exarchate of Addis Abeba (Ethiopian) Archeparchy of Addis Abeba (Ethiopian)
25 November 2003Territory LostArcheparchy of Addis Abeba (Ethiopian) Eparchy of Emdeber (Ethiopian) (erected)

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Archeparchy of Addis Abeba (Ethiopian)
197026,5007,300,000.4%175875353846214ap1971
198033,80013,307,000.3%1954734637810522ap1981
199046,62114,256,000.3%23567959018514523ap1991
199951,73219,822,163.3%2914317230030122129ap2000
200020,64320,195,700.1%3314217511730721929ap2001
200149,85220,705,590.2%2514216729830721929ap2002
200251,19621,265,000.2%2714216930224821933ap2003
200334,20421,881,685.2%2113615721718820721ap2004
200432,21016,472,490.2%2213615820322620714ap2005
200627,62025,274,000.1%249011424220525320ap2007
201023,96627,276,000.1%307910921912429930ap2010
201227,02428,781,000.1%25126151178116632025ap2013

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.7, 12 Jan 2014; data: 12 Jan 2014