Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Hailé Mariam Cahsai

Deceased

Bishop of Adigrat (Ethiopian)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Apr 1895BornMonoxoito
30 Aug 192530.3Ordained PriestPriest
24 Feb 195155.8AppointedApostolic Exarch of Addis Abeba (Ethiopian), Ethiopia
24 Feb 195155.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Sozusa in Libya
1 May 195156.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Sozusa in Libya
20 Feb 196165.8AppointedBishop of Adigrat (Ethiopian), Ethiopia
24 Nov 197075.6DiedBishop of Adigrat (Ethiopian), Ethiopia

MicroData Summary for Hailé Mariam Cahsai:
Bishop Hailé Mariam Cahsai (born , died ) Bishop of Adigrat

  • a priest for 45.2 years
  • a bishop for 19.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1951, Number 39

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015