Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Varghese Thottamkara, C.M.

Vicar Apostolic of Nekemte

Titular Bishop of Chullu


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Jun 1959 BornThottuva, India
10 May 198626.9Solemn ProfessedMember of Congregation of the Mission
6 Jan 198727.6Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Mission
28 Jun 201354.1AppointedCoadjutor Vicar Apostolic of Nekemte, Ethiopia
28 Jun 201354.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Chullu
13 Aug 201354.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Chullu
10 Nov 201354.4SucceededVicar Apostolic of Nekemte, Ethiopia

MicroData Summary for Varghese Thottamkara:
Bishop Varghese Thottamkara C.M. (born ) Vicar Apostolic of Nekemte

Please contact the Bishop through the Vicariate Apostolic of Nekemte.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 28 Jun 2013
  • ob: CB, 13 Aug 2013
  • c2+: CB, 16 Aug 2013
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 215, Number 17,848
  • s: Bollettino, 10 Nov 2013

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.3, 27 Sep 2013; data: 10 Nov 2013