Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Luca Brandolini, C.M.

Bishop Emeritus of Sora-Aquino-Pontecorvo


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Dec 1933 BornMontecompatri
18 Oct 195521.8ProfessedMember of Congregation of the Mission
24 Apr 196026.3Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Mission
29 Oct 198753.8AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Roma {Rome}, Italy
29 Oct 198753.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Urusi
7 Dec 198753.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Urusi
2 Sep 199359.6AppointedBishop of Sora-Aquino-Pontecorvo, Italy
19 Jun 200975.4RetiredBishop of Sora-Aquino-Pontecorvo, Italy

MicroData Summary for Luca Brandolini:
Bishop Luca Brandolini C.M. (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Sora-Aquino-Pontecorvo

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Sora-Aquino-Pontecorvo.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 19 Jun 2009
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 112, Number 9,909
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 148, Deceased Cardinals (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
Code: web_b, v3.0.1, 18 Dec 2014; Data: 18 Dec 2014