Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Leonardus Dobbelaar, C.M. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic of Nekemte

Titular Bishop of Luperciana


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 May 1942BornHulst
20 Jun 196927.1Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Mission
10 Jun 199452.1AppointedVicar Apostolic of Nekemte, Ethiopia
10 Jun 199452.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Luperciana
4 Sep 199452.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Luperciana
21 Mar 200865.9DiedVicar Apostolic of Nekemte, Ethiopia

MicroData Summary for Leonardus Dobbelaar:
Bishop Leonardus Dobbelaar C.M. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic of Nekemte

  • a priest for 38.8 years
  • a bishop for 13.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 141, Number 12,477
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 196, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013