Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Domenico Crescentino Marinozzi, O.F.M. Cap.

Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Soddo-Hosanna

Titular Bishop of Iucundiana


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Nov 1926 BornSan Severino Marche
17 Dec 195024.1Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor Capuchin
197245.1AppointedApostolic Administrator of Hosanna, Ethiopia
23 Feb 197952.3AppointedPrefect of Soddo-Hosanna, Ethiopia
15 Oct 198255.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Iucundiana
15 Oct 198255.9AppointedVicar Apostolic of Soddo-Hosanna, Ethiopia
10 Dec 198256.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Iucundiana
5 Jan 200780.1RetiredVicar Apostolic of Soddo-Hosanna, Ethiopia

MicroData Summary for Domenico Crescentino Marinozzi:
Bishop Domenico Crescentino Marinozzi O.F.M. Cap. (born ) Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Soddo-Hosanna

Please contact the Bishop through the Vicariate Apostolic of Soddo-Hosanna.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 5 Jan 2007
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 142

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.7, 12 Jan 2014; data: 12 Jan 2014