Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Loris Francesco Cardinal Capovilla

Deceased

Prelate Emeritus of Loreto

Cardinal-Priest of Santa Maria in Trastevere


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Oct 1915BornPontelongo
23 May 194024.6Ordained PriestPriest of Venezia {Venice}, Italy
26 Jun 196751.6AppointedArchbishop of Chieti, Italy
16 Jul 196751.7Ordained BishopArchbishop of Chieti, Italy
25 Sep 197155.9AppointedPrelate of Loreto, Italy
25 Sep 197155.9AppointedTitular Archbishop of Mesembria
10 Dec 198873.1ResignedPrelate of Loreto, Italy
22 Feb 201498.3Elevated to Cardinal
22 Feb 201498.3AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Maria in Trastevere
26 May 2016100.6DiedPrelate Emeritus of Loreto, Italy

MicroData Summary for Loris Francesco Capovilla
Loris Francesco Cardinal Capovilla (born , died ) Prelate Emeritus of Loreto

  • a priest for 76.0 years
  • a bishop for 48.8 years
  • a cardinal for 2.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c: Bollettino, 12 Jan 2014
  • cp: Bollettino, 22 Feb 2014
  • d: CB, 26 May 2016

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 26 May 2016