Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Fikre-Mariam Ghemetchu, C.M. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Nekemte

Titular Bishop of Fussala


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Nov 1926BornConchi
11 Nov 195226.0ProfessedMember of Congregation of the Mission
15 Sep 195730.8Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Mission
28 Oct 198558.9AppointedVicar Apostolic of Nekemte, Ethiopia
28 Oct 198558.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Fussala
16 Feb 198659.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Fussala
18 Jan 199467.2ResignedVicar Apostolic of Nekemte, Ethiopia
8 Mar 199568.3DiedVicar Apostolic Emeritus of Nekemte, Ethiopia

MicroData Summary for Fikre-Mariam Ghemetchu:
Bishop Fikre-Mariam Ghemetchu C.M. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Nekemte

  • a priest for 37.5 years
  • a bishop for 9.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 144
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 173, Deceased Cardinals (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013