Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Zekarias Yohannes

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Asmara (Ethiopian)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 May 1925BornAdigenú
2 Jun 194924.0Ordained PriestPriest of Asmara (Ethiopian), Eritrea
29 Jan 198155.7AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Asmara (Ethiopian), Eritrea
29 Jan 198155.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Barca
6 Jun 198156.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Barca
17 Jul 198459.1AppointedBishop of Asmara (Ethiopian), Eritrea
25 Jun 200176.1RetiredBishop of Asmara (Ethiopian), Eritrea
1 Dec 201691.5DiedBishop Emeritus of Asmara (Ethiopian), Eritrea

MicroData Summary for Zekarias Yohannes (VIAF: 2086888)
Bishop Zekarias Yohannes (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Asmara

  • a priest for 67.4 years
  • a bishop for 35.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 173, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • d: CB, 1 Dec 2016

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 2 Dec 2016