Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Tesfamariam Bedho

Deceased

Bishop of Keren (Eritrean)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Sep 1934BornDeroq
19 Dec 196531.2Ordained PriestPriest
21 Dec 199561.2AppointedBishop of Keren (Eritrean), Eritrea
4 Feb 199661.3Ordained BishopBishop of Keren (Eritrean), Eritrea
29 Jul 200267.8DiedBishop of Keren (Eritrean), Eritrea

MicroData Summary for Tesfamariam Bedho:
Bishop Tesfamariam Bedho (born , died ) Bishop of Keren

  • a priest for 36.6 years
  • a bishop for 6.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 144, Number 12,683
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 169, Necrology (back)
  • d: Annuario Pontificio, Year 2003, Page 1,067
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 173, Deceased Cardinals (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015