Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Menghesteab Tesfamariam, M.C.C.I.

Archbishop of Asmara (Eritrean), Eritrea


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Dec 1948 Born
18 Feb 197930.1Ordained PriestPriest of Comboni Missionaries of the Heart of Jesus
25 Jun 200152.5AppointedBishop of Asmara (Ethiopian), Eritrea
16 Sep 200152.7Ordained BishopBishop of Asmara (Ethiopian), Eritrea
19 Jan 201566.0AppointedArchbishop of Asmara (Eritrean), Eritrea

MicroData Summary for Menghesteab Tesfamariam
Archbishop Menghesteab Tesfamariam M.C.C.I. (born ) Archbishop of Asmara

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBerakit

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archeparchy of Asmara (Eritrean).

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 164, Number 14,049
  • ab: Bollettino, 19 Jan 2015

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast