Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Luca Milesi, O.F.M. Cap. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Barentu (Ethiopian)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Apr 1924BornSan Giovanni Bianco
4 Mar 195025.9Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor Capuchin
21 Dec 199571.7AppointedBishop of Barentu (Ethiopian), Eritrea
4 Feb 199671.8Ordained BishopBishop of Barentu (Ethiopian), Eritrea
4 Oct 200177.5RetiredBishop of Barentu (Ethiopian), Eritrea
22 May 200884.1DiedBishop Emeritus of Barentu (Ethiopian), Eritrea

MicroData Summary for Luca Milesi:
Bishop Luca Milesi O.F.M. Cap. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Barentu

  • a priest for 58.2 years
  • a bishop for 12.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 144, Number 12,682
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 173, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 196, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013