Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Vicariate Apostolic of Asmara

Apostolicus Vicariatus Asmarensis Latinorum

Suppressed



Show: All | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Historical Details


Past Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Prefecture Apostolic of Eritrea
13 September 1894ErectedPrefecture Apostolic of Eritrea (erected)
Vicariate Apostolic of Eritrea
7 February 1911ElevatedPrefecture Apostolic of Eritrea Vicariate Apostolic of Eritrea
Vicariate Apostolic of Asmara
25 July 1959Name ChangedVicariate Apostolic of Eritrea Vicariate Apostolic of Asmara
1995SuppressedVicariate Apostolic of Asmara (suppressed)

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Vicariate Apostolic of Eritrea
195047,000900,0005.2%8626111ap1951
Vicariate Apostolic of Asmara
197080,0001,500,0005.3%73731,09595397ap1971
198021,0001,500,0001.4%999921217235619ap1981
199029,6222,300,0001.3%41417225612019ap1991

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.0, 19 Jun 2013; data: 4 Jul 2013