Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Bernard Cyril O’Grady, O.P.

Bishop Emeritus of Gizo


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Aug 1931 BornAdelaide, Australia
1 Dec 195625.3Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Preachers
3 Feb 199563.4AppointedBishop of Gizo, Solomon Islands
19 May 199563.7Ordained BishopBishop of Gizo, Solomon Islands
5 Jun 200775.8RetiredBishop of Gizo, Solomon Islands

MicroData Summary for Bernard Cyril O’Grady:
Bishop Bernard Cyril O’Grady O.P. (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Gizo

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Gizo.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 5 Jun 2007
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 142, Number 12,554

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.8, 8 Mar 2014; data: 19 Sep 2014