Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Rafael Sanus Abad

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Valencia, Spain

Titular Bishop of Germaniciana


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 Aug 1931Born
22 Jun 195826.8Ordained PriestPriest of Valencia, Spain
3 Feb 198957.4AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Valencia, Spain
3 Feb 198957.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Germaniciana
12 Mar 198957.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Germaniciana
17 Nov 200069.2ResignedAuxiliary Bishop of Valencia, Spain
13 May 201078.7DiedAuxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Valencia, Spain

MicroData Summary for Rafael Sanus Abad
Bishop Rafael Sanus Abad (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Valencia

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAlcoy

  • a priest for 51.8 years
  • a bishop for 21.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 114, Number 10,142
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 204, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast