Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Alberto Iniesta Jiménez

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Madrid

Titular Bishop of Tubernuca


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Jan 1923BornAlbacete
13 Jul 195835.5Ordained PriestPriest
5 Sep 197249.6AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Madrid, Spain
5 Sep 197249.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Tubernuca
22 Oct 197249.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Tubernuca
5 Apr 199875.2RetiredAuxiliary Bishop of Madrid, Spain
3 Jan 201692.9DiedAuxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Madrid, Spain

MicroData Summary for Alberto Iniesta Jiménez:
Bishop Alberto Iniesta Jiménez (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Madrid

  • a priest for 57.4 years
  • a bishop for 43.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 140
  • d: CB, 3 Jan 2016

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.1, 31 Dec 2015; Data: 3 Jan 2016