Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Ireneo García Alonso

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Albacete, Spain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Mar 1923Born
27 Mar 194825.0Ordained PriestPriest
7 Dec 196845.7AppointedBishop of Albacete, Spain
25 Jan 196945.8Ordained BishopBishop of Albacete, Spain
4 Aug 198057.3ResignedBishop of Albacete, Spain
4 Jun 201289.1DiedBishop Emeritus of Albacete, Spain

MicroData Summary for Ireneo García Alonso
Bishop Ireneo García Alonso (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Albacete

EventPlace
Birth PlaceQuintanilla Vivar
Ordained BishopCathedral, Albacete, Diocese of Albacete

  • a priest for 64.1 years
  • a bishop for 43.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 123
  • d: CB, 4 Jun 2012
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 212, Necrology (back)
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 5, Number 199

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast