Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francisco Frutos y Valiente

Deceased

Bishop of Salamanca


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 May 1883BornMurcia
24 May 190724.0Ordained PriestPriest
21 Sep 192037.3AppointedBishop of Jaca, Spain
9 Jan 192137.6Ordained BishopBishop of Jaca, Spain
28 Feb 192137.7InstalledBishop of Jaca, Spain
14 Dec 192542.5AppointedBishop of Salamanca, Spain
24 Jan 193349.6DiedBishop of Salamanca, Spain

MicroData Summary for Francisco Frutos y Valiente:
Bishop Francisco Frutos y Valiente (born , died ) Bishop of Salamanca

  • a priest for 25.6 years
  • a bishop for 12.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1921, Number 2

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015