Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Manuel López Arana

Deceased

Apostolic Administrator of Ciudad Rodrigo, Spain

Titular Bishop of Curium


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Apr 1884Born
14 Jul 190723.2Ordained PriestPriest
5 Feb 192944.7AppointedApostolic Administrator of Ciudad Rodrigo, Spain
5 Feb 192944.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Curium
10 Mar 192944.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Curium
27 Dec 194157.6DiedApostolic Administrator of Ciudad Rodrigo, Spain

MicroData Summary for Manuel López Arana
Bishop Manuel López Arana (born , died ) Apostolic Administrator of Ciudad Rodrigo

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMedina de Pomar

  • a priest for 34.4 years
  • a bishop for 12.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1929, Number 17

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018