Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Vicente Alonso y Salgado, Sch. P. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Cartagena (en España)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Jan 1845Born
21 May 189449.3AppointedBishop of Astorga, Spain
16 Sep 189449.6Ordained BishopBishop of Astorga, Spain
25 Jun 190358.4AppointedBishop of Cartagena (en España)
Jun 1930³85.3RetiredBishop of Cartagena (en España)
6 Oct 193186.7DiedBishop Emeritus of Cartagena (en España)

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Vicente Alonso y Salgado (VIAF: 309573567)
Bishop Vicente Alonso y Salgado Sch. P. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Cartagena (en España)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceQuiroganes, Diocese of Orense
Ordained BishopS. Antonio-Ecoles Pies, Madrid, Archdiocese of Toledo

  • a bishop for 37.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 128, and Page 186
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1894, Number 51

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 12 Jun 2017