Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Vicente Calvo y Valero

Deceased

Bishop of Cádiz y Ceuta


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 May 1838BornSevilla
18 Jun 187537.1SelectedBishop of Santander, Spain
5 Jul 187537.1ConfirmedBishop of Santander, Spain
28 Oct 187537.4Ordained BishopBishop of Santander, Spain
27 Mar 188445.8AppointedBishop of Cádiz y Ceuta, Spain
27 Jun 189860.1DiedBishop of Cádiz y Ceuta, Spain

MicroData Summary for Vicente Calvo y Valero:
Bishop Vicente Calvo y Valero (born , died ) Bishop of Cádiz y Ceuta

  • a bishop for 22.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 280, and Page 500
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1868, Page 42, Number 16

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015