Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Benito Murúa y López

Deceased

Archbishop of Burgos, Spain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Mar 1846Born
18 Sep 186923.4Ordained PriestPriest
21 May 189448.1AppointedBishop of Lugo, Spain
15 Aug 189448.4Ordained BishopBishop of Lugo, Spain
29 Apr 190963.1AppointedArchbishop of Burgos, Spain
28 Oct 191266.6DiedArchbishop of Burgos, Spain

MicroData Summary for Benito Murúa y López
Archbishop Benito Murúa y López (born , died ) Archbishop of Burgos

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAlgete
Ordained BishopCathedral, Cádiz, Diocese of Cádiz y Ceuta

  • a priest for 43.1 years
  • a bishop for 18.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 350
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 9, Page 96
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1894, Number 44

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018