Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Sebastián Cardinal Herrero y Espinosa de los Monteros, C.O. †

Deceased

Archbishop of Valencia

Cardinal-Priest of Santi Bonifacio ed Alessio


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Jan 1822BornJerez de la Frontera
1860²37.9Ordained PriestPriest of Confederation of Oratorians of St. Philip Neri
23 Jun 187553.4SelectedBishop of Cuenca, Spain
17 Sep 187553.7ConfirmedBishop of Cuenca, Spain
30 Nov 187553.9Ordained BishopBishop of Cuenca, Spain
22 Nov 187654.8SelectedBishop of Vitoria, Spain
18 Dec 187654.9ConfirmedBishop of Vitoria, Spain
Jun 1880³58.4ResignedBishop of Vitoria, Spain
16 Dec 188159.9SelectedBishop of Oviedo, Spain
27 Mar 188260.2ConfirmedBishop of Oviedo, Spain
15 Mar 188361.2AppointedBishop of Córdoba, Spain
24 Mar 189876.2AppointedArchbishop of Valencia, Spain
22 Jun 190381.4Elevated to Cardinal
27 Aug 190381.6AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santi Bonifacio ed Alessio
9 Dec 190381.9DiedArchbishop of Valencia, Spain

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Sebastián Herrero y Espinosa de los Monteros:
Cardinal Sebastián Herrero y Espinosa de los Monteros C.O. (born , died ) Archbishop of Valencia

  • a priest for 43.9 years
  • a bishop for 28.0 years
  • a cardinal for .5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 22 Jun 1903
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 220, and Page 225
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 431, and Page 579
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 590, and Page 47

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013